EP1055226 - SYSTEM FOR USING SILENCE IN SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Li 15360 N.E. 66th Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2011/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/48] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99906851.3 | 09.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999US02803 | Priority number, date | US19980026841 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: US 26841 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942991 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055226 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055226 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/187 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
G10L15/05 (EP,US);
G10L15/183 (KR);
G10L15/08 (EP,US);
G10L15/187 (EP,US);
G10L2015/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/48] | G10L5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/33] |
Former [2000/48] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON STILLE IN SPRACHERKENNUNG | [2000/48] | English: | SYSTEM FOR USING SILENCE IN SPEECH RECOGNITION | [2000/48] | French: | SYSTEME D'UTILISATION DU SILENCE DANS LA RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.06.2016 | 28.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | [2019/12] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0762358 (ZITON SA PROPRIETARY LIMITED [ZA]) [A] 3,4,11,12,18,30,40 * abstract * * page 2, line 45 - line 50 ** page 3, line 5 - line 8 *; | [A] - COLE R A ET AL, "Experiments with a spoken dialogue system for taking the US census", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, (19971101), vol. 23, no. 3, page 243-260, XP004112587 [A] 1,2,9,10,15-17,27,28,32,33,38,41 * abstract * * page 245, column L, line 32 - column R, line 10 * * page 248, column L, line 1 - line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-6393(97)00049-6 | Examination | EP1012827 | - "AUTOMATIC SPEECH SEGMENT BOUNDARY DETECTION USING MARKOV MODELS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19901201), vol. 33, no. 7, ISSN 0018-8689, page 323/324, XP000108438 | - JELINEK F, "THE DEVELOPMENT OF AN EXPERIMENTAL DISCRETE DICTATION RECOGNIZER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19851101), vol. 73, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1616 - 1624, XP001197009 |