EP0972349 - INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION USING MODAL MOMENT ESTIMATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Dynamics Decision Systems, Inc. 8220 East Roosevelt Street Scottsdale, AZ 85257 / US | [2002/14] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGSTROM, Chad, Scott 501 S. Oak Chandler, AZ 85226 / US | 02 /
CHUPRUN, Jeffrey, Scott 9034 E. Camino Del Santo Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | 03 /
KLEIDER, John, Eric 8501 E. Turney Avenue Scottsdale, AZ 85251 / US | 04 /
GUZEK, Amy, Michelle 10605 E. Beechnut Drive Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/03] | Morgan, Marc, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908084.9 | 28.01.1999 | [2000/03] | WO1999US01897 | Priority number, date | US19980016877 | 30.01.1998 Original published format: US 16877 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939445 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972349 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/12, H04B1/713, H04B7/005, H04K3/00 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
H04K3/228 (EP,US);
H04B1/123 (EP,US);
H04B1/713 (EP,US);
H04B2001/7152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SCHÄTZWERTEN MODALER MOMENTE | [2000/03] | English: | INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION USING MODAL MOMENT ESTIMATES | [2000/03] | French: | SUPPRESSION D'INTERFERENCES A L'AIDE D'ESTIMATIONS DE MOMENT DE MODE | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 13.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/18] | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3833797 (GROBMAN L, et al) [A] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - line 46 * * column 2, line 49 - line 53 * * column 4, line 26 - line 30 *; | [A]US4613978 (KURTH RICHARD R [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - line 66 * * column 4, line 3 - line 14 * * column 4, line 24 - line 28 * * column 7, line 4 - line 43 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5018088 (HIGBIE JAMES H [US]) [A] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 18 * * column 8, line 5 - line 12 * * column 9, line 8 - line 16 * * column 10, line 24 - line 36 * * column 13, line 17 - line 22 * * column 15, line 7 - line 20 *; | [A]US5271038 (CAI KHIEM V [US]) [A] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 28 - line 34 * * column 5, line 32 - line 53 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 8 * * column 9, line 24 - line 29 * * figures 2A-2D * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5289194 (SCHLOSSER THOMAS W [US]) [A] 1,4,6,7,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - line 37 * * column 3, line 56 - line 66 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 23 *; | [A] - WONG R S C ET AL, "DENOISING OF LO0W SNR SIGNALS USING COMPOSITE WAVELET SHRINKAGE", STAHL UND EISEN, (19970820), pages 302 - 305, XP000804652 [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] - paragraph [00II] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PACRIM.1997.619960 |