EP1064527 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING SUBSTRATE TEMPERATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEUSE, Bruce, W. 27 Cobblestone Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 02 /
MINER, Gary, E. 4974 Hildasue Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 03 /
YAM, Mark 4977 Adaiz Way San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 04 /
HUNTER, Aaron 430 Emeline Avenue Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 05 /
KNOOT, Peter 158 Northam Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 06 /
MERSHON, Jason 660 Monroe Street Santa Clara, CA 94040 / US | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908403.1 | 23.02.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999US03978 | Priority number, date | US19980044217 | 18.03.1998 Original published format: US 44217 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947901 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064527 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064527 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/00, G01J5/04 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
G01J5/08 (EP,US);
G01J5/00 (KR);
G01J5/0003 (EP,US);
G01J5/0007 (EP,US);
G01J5/064 (EP,US);
G01J5/0815 (EP,US);
G01J5/0818 (EP,US);
G01J5/0821 (EP,US);
G01J5/0846 (EP,US);
G01J5/0887 (EP,US);
G01J5/53 (EP,US);
G01J5/80 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MESSEN VON SUBSTRATTEMPERATUREN | [2001/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING SUBSTRATE TEMPERATURES | [2001/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE MESURE DE TEMPERATURE DE SUBSTRATS | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.04.2004 | IT | 07.04.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 07.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0718610 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,7,12,13 * page 7, line 35 - page 8, line 6 ** claims 1,13 *; | [A]EP0805342 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,7,12,13 * page 3, line 38 - line 50 * * page 7, line 6 - line 22 * * figures 3,4 * |