EP1056450 - FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Phytochemistry Research Labs, Ltd. Suite 107, 4870 Haygood Road Virginia Beach, VA 23455 / US | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAIKENOV, Tattym, E. ALMATY / KZ | 02 /
ADEKENOV, Sergazy, M. Karaganda / KZ | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908471.8 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999US04124 | Priority number, date | US19980030300 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: US 30300 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9943314 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056450 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/34, A61K31/66, C07C53/136, C07D307/93, C07D407/02 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K33/24 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D303/38 (EP,US);
C07D307/93 (EP,US);
C07D307/935 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Extension states | AL | 25.09.2000 | LT | 25.09.2000 | LV | 25.09.2000 | MK | 25.09.2000 | RO | 25.09.2000 | SI | 25.09.2000 | Title | German: | FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE INHIBITOREN | [2000/49] | English: | FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE INHIBITORS | [2000/49] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE FARNESYL PROTEINE TRANSFERASE | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 03.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 07.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9848789 (PARACURE INC DOING BUSINESS AS [US]) [PX] 6-8 * page 9, lines 5,6 * * tables III,IV * * example 6 *; | [Y] - OVERHAND M ET AL, "Synthesis of triphosphonate analogues of farnesyl pyrophosphate. Inhibitors of squalene synthase and protein:farnesyl transferase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, (19970923), vol. 7, no. 18, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2435 - 2440, XP004136459 [Y] 1-23 * formula A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)00448-4 | [Y] - SHAIKENOV ET AL, "Arglabine as a novel inhibitor of the farnesylation of Ras proteins", STN CAPLUS, XP002114697 [Y] 1-23 * abstract * | International search | [X] - ADEKENOV, ET AL., ""THE CHEMISTRY OF SESQUITERPENE LACTONES"", CHEMISTRY OF SESQUITERPENE LACTONES, XX, XX, XX, (19900101), pages 01 - 17 + 20, XP002919766 | [X] - BLANCO J. G., ET AL., "A NOVEL ACTIVITY FOR A GROUP OF SESQUITERPENE LACTONES: INHIBITION OF AROMATASE.", FEBS LETTERS., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19970101), vol. 409., doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00560-7, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 396 - 400., XP002919765 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00560-7 |