EP1064333 - COATING COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRC-Desoto International, Inc. 2820 Empire Avenue Burbank, CA 91504 / US | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARSON, Peter Fairleigh, Dale Road Shildon, County Durham DL4 2LB / GB | 02 /
FRANCE, Joanne 4 Hird Road, Yarm Cleveland TS15 9DX / GB | 03 /
BROOKS, Rodney Ralph 3 Oakham Avenue, Fellside Pa rk, Whickham Gateshead, Tyne and Wear NE16 5YU / GB | 04 /
FOWLER, Michael 5 Easedale Close, St. Nicholas Park Nuneaton, Warwickshire CV11 6EX / GB | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99909094.7 | 16.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999GB00777 | Priority number, date | GB19980005836 | 18.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805836 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947613 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064333 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064333 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/12, B05D7/00, B05D5/00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C09D163/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/63 (EP,KR,US);
B05D5/00 (EP,US);
B05D7/52 (EP,US);
C09D133/04 (KR);
C09D167/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/08 (KR);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08K5/13 (EP,US);
C08K5/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/3465 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
C09D167/00, C08L2666/28 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | ÜBERZUGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2001/01] | English: | COATING COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES | [2001/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT ET PROCEDES | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0014597 (STERWIN AG [CH]); | [DA]EP0147984 (INT PAINT PLC [GB]); | [A]US5635572 (OHNISHI KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] * column 11, lines 21-25; claim 9 * |