|
06.05.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
27.11.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
04.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
25.03.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.03.2010 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
25.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
18 |
|
30.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.10.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.09.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
55 |