EP1066200 - BAG WITH SELF-CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson France Rue Aristide Bergès 38800 Le Pont-de-Claix / FR | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORRET, Jean-Yves 22, rue de la Plaine F-38610 Gières / FR | 02 /
IMBERT, Claude 10, chemin Concorde F-38700 La Tronche / FR | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99911862.3 | 01.04.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999FR00768 | Priority number, date | FR19980004406 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804406 | [2001/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951505 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066200 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066200 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/16, B65D77/14 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
B65D77/14 (EP,US);
B65D33/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHLIESSENDER SACK | [2001/02] | English: | BAG WITH SELF-CLOSURE | [2001/02] | French: | SAC AVEC AUTO-FERMETURE | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 02.01.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.02.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.12.2001 | [2003/10] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE29701558U (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]BE729022 (WALRAVE) [A] 1 * figures 4,5; claim 5 *; | [A]DE2246752 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER) [A] 1 |