|
19.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.03.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2008 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.01.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.12.2007 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.11.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.09.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
98 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.02.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.02.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.02.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.02.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.02.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
25.10.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
29 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |