|
10.06.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
13 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
16 |