|
21.04.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
06.07.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
19 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.03.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
16.09.2004 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2002 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.10.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
20 |