|
17.05.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
19.04.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.02.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.01.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.01.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
21.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.01.2016 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.06.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
28.05.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.05.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
31.03.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2010 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
13 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.04.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
12.11.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.11.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
25.10.1999 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.10.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |