blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1075487

EP1075487 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALPHAGENE, INC.
45 Rangers Drive
Hudson, NH 03051-3537 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
Alphagene, Inc.
10 Cedar Street
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VALENZUELA, Dario
260 West Cummings Park
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
02 / YUAN, Olive
260 West Cummings Park
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
03 / HOFFMAN, Heidi
260 West Cummings Park
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
04 / HALL, Jeff
260 West Cummings Park
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
05 / RAPIEJKO, Peter
260 West Cummings Park
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99922717.623.04.1999
[2001/07]
WO1999US08504
Priority number, dateUS19980082904P24.04.1998         Original published format: US 82904 P
US19980088994P11.06.1998         Original published format: US 88994 P
US19980089278P12.06.1998         Original published format: US 89278 P
US19980091647P02.07.1998         Original published format: US 91647 P
US19980097639P24.08.1998         Original published format: US 97639 P
[2001/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9955721
Date:04.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1075487
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2002
ClassificationIPC:C07H21/04, C07K14/435, C12N1/20, C12P21/02, A61K38/00
[2001/07]
CPC:
C07K14/47 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/07]
TitleGerman:SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND FÜR DIESE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE[2001/07]
English:SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM[2001/07]
French:PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT[2001/07]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase08.11.2000National basic fee paid 
08.11.2000Search fee paid 
08.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/07]
07.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.11.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000CY   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000MC   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
08.11.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.11.2000M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9748801  (GENETICS INST) [X] 1-11 * page 14, line 29 - page 19, line 7 *;
 [PX]WO9906551  (GENSET SA ;LACROIX BRUNO (FR); DUCLERT AYMERIC (FR); DUMAS MILNE E) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - "EST179381 HCC cell line (metastasis to liver in mouse) II Homo sapiens DNA", EMBL, (19970418), Database accession no. AA308563, XP002213862 [XD] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CLAROS MANUEL G ET AL, "Prediction of N-terminal protein sorting signals.", CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 0959-440X, pages 394 - 398, XP002213563 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-440X(97)80057-7
International search[X]  - GERSHON P. D., ET AL., "EARLY TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR SUBUNITS ARE ENCODED BY VACCINIA VIRUS LATE GENES.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19900601), vol. 87., doi:10.1073/pnas.87.11.4401, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4401 - 4405., XP002921601

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.11.4401
 [X]  - LOETSCHER M, ET AL., "CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR SPECIFIC FOR IP10 AND MIG: STRUCTURE FUNCTION AND EXPRESSION IN ACTIVATED T-LYMPHOCYTES", The Journal of Experimental Medicine, Rockefeller University Press, US, US, (19960101), vol. 184, doi:10.1084/jem.184.3.963, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 963 - 969, XP002921602

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.184.3.963
 [A]  - DATABASE MEDLINE ON STN, EST, Accession No. T35343, ADAMS et al., EST83120 Homo Sapiens cDNA 5' End Similar to None. Initial Assesment of Human Gene Diversity and Expression Patterns Based Upon 52 Million Basepairs of cDNA Sequence. Available in Database 6 Sept. 1995, 100% Sequence Match over 297 Nucleotide Bases, Corresponding to
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.