|
13.09.2016 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Description |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
11.03.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.05.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2010 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2010 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
42 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2009 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2009 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
44 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
23 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
74 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
30 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.02.2000 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.01.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |