|
28.10.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Cover page: Decision (ex parte) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.03.2006 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
17 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.11.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.10.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.10.2003 |
Request for change of name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2003 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
19 |