|
07.07.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.04.2013 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
19.11.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
25 |