EP1076785 - INFINITELY VARIABLE TOROIDAL DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUHN, Walter Säntisstrasse 19 D-88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
WAFZIG, Jürgen Graf-Ernst-Weg 7 D-88097 Eriskirch / DE | 03 /
HOHER, Markus Linzgaustrasse 52 D-88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2001/08] | Application number, filing date | 99924863.6 | 03.05.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999EP02983 | Priority number, date | DE1998120071 | 06.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19820071 | [2001/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957460 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076785 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/38 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
F16H15/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/10] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES REIBRADGETRIEBE | [2001/08] | English: | INFINITELY VARIABLE TOROIDAL DRIVE | [2001/08] | French: | BOITE TOROIDALE A REGLAGE CONTINU | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/40] | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]DE19754725 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [E] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [PX]WO9905434 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * page 8, line 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3087348 (KRAUS CHARLES E) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 64 - line 66 * * column 6, line 36 - line 69 * * column 8, line 16 - line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4968289 (NAKANO MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR964322 (BREVETS AÉRO-MÉCANIQUES S.A.) [A] 1 * page 2, line 37 - line 44 * * figure 1 *; | [PA]JPH1151137 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 099, no. 005, & JP11051137 A 19990223 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [PA] 1 * abstract * |