|
29.08.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Letter relating to the request for the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Letter relating to the revocation of the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
31.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2023 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2023 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2023 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.02.2023 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.02.2023 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
23 |
|
20.02.2023 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2023 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
135 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
77 |
|
26.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.07.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 16 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 17 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 18 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 19 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 20 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 21 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 008 |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
41 |
|
09.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
19.05.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2020 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
29 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Description submitted during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
53 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
31 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
113 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
23.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Description |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
16.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
02.03.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.03.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
02.03.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
25.11.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.11.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.06.1999 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |