|
28.04.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
10.03.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
08.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
39 |
|
11.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.08.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.04.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Brief communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
151 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2001 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |