|
04.02.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.06.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.05.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2009 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2009 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2009 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.02.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.04.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the International Representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.06.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
43 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.08.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.05.2000 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
29.05.2000 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
29.05.2000 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.09.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.09.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
08.09.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.09.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |