EP1027163 - PARTICLE SEPARATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITANO, Yoichiro Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
NAGAHARA, Hironari Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
KANBARA, Tetsuya Mazda Motor Corp., 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K. Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99940542.6 | 30.08.1999 | [2000/33] | WO1999JP04659 | Priority number, date | JP19980245840 | 31.08.1998 Original published format: JP 24584098 | JP19990209617 | 23.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20961799 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012220 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027163 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B04C9/00, B03D1/14, B03B5/34 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B03B5/34 (EP,US);
B04C9/00 (EP,KR,US);
B03D1/1418 (EP,US);
B03D1/1475 (EP,US);
B04C2009/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN VON TEILCHEN | [2000/33] | English: | PARTICLE SEPARATING APPARATUS | [2000/33] | French: | APPAREIL DE SEPARATION DE PARTICULES | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH05277402 ; | [YA]DE4302358 (KURTZE) [Y] 26,27,30 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 24; figure - * [A] 1,8,10,11,16,21,22,28; | [A]GB2058737 (SHINRYO AIR COND) [A] 1,8,10,11,16,21,22,26-28,30 * abstract * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 18 - line 25; figures 2,5,6 *; | [A]FR2726203 (GEC ALSTHOM ACB [FR]) [A] 1,8,10,16,21,22,26-28,30 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 35; figure . *; | [A]DE1175621 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 1,8,10,16,21,22,26-28,30 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 29; figure - *; | [A]GB2162092 (TRADE & INDUSTRY SECRETARY OF) [A] 1,6,8,10,16,21,22,26-28,30 * abstract * * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 24; figure - *; | [A]FR998240 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 1,2,4,8-10,16,21,22,26-28,30 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, column L, line 12 - line 56; figure - * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940202), vol. 18, no. 61, Database accession no. (C - 1160), & JP05277402 A 19931026 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.) [Y] 26,27,30 * abstract * [A] 1,8,10,16,21,22,26-28,30 |