EP1114277 - EDGE-LIT ILLUMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucite International UK Limited Queens Gate, 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Lucite International UK Limited Queens Gate, 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | ||
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Ineos Acrylics UK Limited 1st Floor, Queens Gate 15-16 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire, SO14 3BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSTER, John, Henry 119 Enfield Chase, Hunters Hill Guisborough, Cleveland TS14 7LH / GB | 02 /
ALLINSON, Heather 71, Salutation Road Darlington DL3 8JW / GB | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Walsh, David Patrick, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Walsh, David Patrick, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99943087.9 | 01.09.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999GB02880 | Priority number, date | GB19980019196 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9819196 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014448 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114277 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114277 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
G02B6/0043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/22] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KANTENBELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2001/28] | English: | EDGE-LIT ILLUMINATION SYSTEM | [2001/28] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE PAR LA TRANCHE | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 26.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/36] | CY | 01.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0457009 (NISSEN KAGAKUKOGYO K K [JP]) [X] 1* abstract *; | [DY]WO9205535 (ASHLAR SCREENPRINTS PTY LTD [AU]) [DY] 2,12 * abstract *; | [XY]JPH0875928 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,12; | [PXY]US5841572 (ANDO RIKA [JP], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document * [PY] 2,12 |