|
20.08.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.02.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.11.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.12.2000 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.10.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.10.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.10.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |