|
08.02.2008 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
11.01.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.11.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.11.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
56 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
56 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
56 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.06.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Description |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Description |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
04.12.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |