|
12.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.04.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
13 |
|
25.03.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
13 |
|
24.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.03.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
17.03.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
17.03.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
234 |
|
17.03.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
02.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
11.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
13 |
|
21.01.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
28 |
|
19.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
24 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
26 |
|
08.12.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
10.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
20.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2014 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
23.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
13 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
04.07.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Annex |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
248 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.07.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
120 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied within the opposition period |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2003 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2001 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
09.03.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |