blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1109924

EP1109924 - METHYLATION OF PLASMID VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENZYME CORPORATION
500 Kendall Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2006/04]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
GENZYME CORPORATION
One Kendall Square
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHENG, Seng, H.
50 Wall Street
Wellesley, MA 02481 / US
02 / MARSHALL, John
25 Northrop Street
Hopedale, MA 01747 / US
03 / SCHEULE, Ronald, K.
25 East Street
Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US
04 / YEW, Nelson, S.
25 Rockdale Hill Circle
West Upton, MA 01568 / US
05 / TOUSIGNANT, Jennifer, D.
282 Stow Road
Harvard MA 01451 / US
06 / PRZYBYLSKA, Malgorzata
169 Mount Vernon Street
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
 [2001/28]
Former [2001/26]01 / CHENG, Seng, H.
50 Wall Street
Wellesley, MA 02481 / US
02 / MARSHALL, John
25 Northrop Street
Hopedale, MA 01747 / US
03 / SCHEULE, Ronald, K.
25 East Street
Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US
04 / YEW, Nelson, S.
25 Rockdale Hill Circle
West Upton, MA 01568 / US
05 / TOUSIGNANT, Jennifer, D.
Apartment 3 70 Spring Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
06 / PRZYBYLSKA, Malgorzata
169 Mount Vernon Street
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
Representative(s)Hermann, Bettina Celia, et al
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Possartstraße 20
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/44]Hermann, Bettina Celia, et al
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstraße 20
81679 München / DE
Former [2005/17]Helbig, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Biol.
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Former [2001/26]Froud, Clive
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99946789.709.09.1999
[2001/26]
WO1999US20506
Priority number, dateUS19980099583P09.09.1998         Original published format: US 99583 P
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0014262
Date:16.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1109924
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/85
[2001/26]
CPC:
C12N15/88 (EP,US); A61K48/00 (EP,US); A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP); A61P37/06 (EP);
C12P19/34 (EP,US); C12N2799/021 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/26]
TitleGerman:METHYLIERUNG VON PLASMID-VEKTOREN[2001/26]
English:METHYLATION OF PLASMID VECTORS[2001/26]
French:METHYLATION DE PLASMIDES VECTEURS[2001/26]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2001National basic fee paid 
07.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
30.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.10.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/49]
Appeal following examination24.11.2005Appeal received No.  T0310/06
26.01.2006Statement of grounds filed
16.10.2006Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn
16.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP06021432.7  / EP1832657
Request for further processing for:11.07.2003Request for further processing filed
11.07.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.07.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9602555  (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,13-15,20,21,23,25 * abstract * * page 8, line 8 - line 25 * * page 11, line 10 - line 20 * * page 18, line 1 - line 13 * * page 21, line 28 - page 22, line 15 *;
 [Y]WO9811211  (HYBRIDON INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,13,15,20,21,23,25 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 25 * * page 10, line 18 - line 23 * * page 15, line 5 - line 23 *;
 [DY]US5747471  (SIEGEL CRAIG S [US], et al) [DY] 1,2,4,6,13,15,20,21,23,25 * column A * * column 8 *;
 [A]JPH06237773  ;
 [A]JPH09206077  ;
 [A]JPH07163377  ;
 [A]JPH0387173  ;
 [A]JPH10127287  ;
 [A]WO9626179  (IMAR PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,24 * abstract * * page 59, line 18 - page 60, line 14 *
 [XA]  - GILBERT W, "pUC13c cloning vector (beta-galactosidase mRNA on complementary strand)", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19930325), XP002131903 [X] 31 * the whole document * [A] 28
 [XA]  - OKA ET AL., "Nucleotide sequence of the kanamycin resistance transposon Tn903", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19820609), XP002131904 [X] 32 * the whole document * [A] 28
 [DA]  - KRIEG A M ET AL, "CPG MOTIFS IN BACTERIAL DNA TRIGGER DIRECT B-CELL ACTIVATION", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, (19950406), vol. 374, ISSN 0028-0836, page 546-549, XP002910391 [DA] 1,6,7,10,13-15,20 * page 546 * * page 549 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374546a0
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 39, Database accession no. 1994-312814, XP002131905 & JPH06237773 A 19940830 (SHIDA H) [A] 3,22 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09206077 A 19970812 (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD:THE) [A] 3,22 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 34, Database accession no. 1995-260052, XP002131906 & JPH07163377 A 19950627 (KOKUZEI CHO CHOKAN) [A] 5,24 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910702), vol. 015, no. 259, Database accession no. (C - 0846), & JP03087173 A 19910411 (TEIJIN LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 5,24 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10127287 A 19980519 (CENTEON PHARMA GMBH) [A] 5,24 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.