|
07.08.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
11.05.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.05.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.04.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.03.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.01.2011 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
20.04.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
14 |