|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.03.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2010 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.12.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.08.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.07.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.05.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |