EP1118038 - ENCAPSULATED ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAYS HAVING A MONOLAYER OF CAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E Ink Corporation 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2001/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRZAIC, Paul 2 Paddock Lane Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 02 /
LOXLEY, Andrew 6 Kingsley Street Allston, MA 02134 / US | 03 /
ALBERT, Jonathan, D. 346 Putnam Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
COMISKEY, Barrett 346 Putnam Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
VALIANATOS, Peter, J. 12 Blackwood Street, Apt. 318 Boston, MA 02115 / US | 06 /
CROSSLEY, Glen 2 Bartlett Avenue Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 07 /
GERAMITA, Katharine 188 Franklin Street, 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 08 /
AMUNDSON, Karl, R. 56 Kirkland Street, Apt. 1 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 09 /
STEINER, Michael, L. 12 Vista Circle Methuen, MA 01844 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Cole, David John, et al 46 Kirkhill Gardens West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Cole, David John, et al 46 Kirkhill Gardens, West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang, Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | ||
Former [2001/30] | Cole, David John, et al Executive Liaison Services 43 Mount Felix Walton-on-Thames Surrey KT12 2PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99950233.9 | 06.10.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US23313 | Priority number, date | US19980103398P | 07.10.1998 Original published format: US 103398 P | US19990118794P | 04.02.1999 Original published format: US 118794 P | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020922 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118038 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/167 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
G02F1/167 (EP,US);
G02F1/16757 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/026 (KR);
G02F2001/1678 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Title | German: | VERKAPSELTE ELEKTOPHORETISCHE ANZIEGEN MIT EINER MONOSCHICHT VON KAPSELN | [2001/30] | English: | ENCAPSULATED ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAYS HAVING A MONOLAYER OF CAPSULES | [2001/30] | French: | AFFICHAGES PAR ELECTROPHORESE ENCAPSULES POURVUS D'UNE MONOCOUCHE DE CAPSULES | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2001 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2015 | 07.07.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/27] | 29.04.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/27] | Appeal following examination | 14.09.2015 | Appeal received No. T0010/16 | 14.04.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2011 | Decision despatched | 04.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2002 | 31.10.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2003 | 31.10.2009 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2010 | 31.10.2010 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2011 | 31.10.2012 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9910767 (E INK CORP [US]) [PX] 1-205 * page 15, line 03 - page 16, line 17 ** page 35, line 06 - line 26 *; | [A] - DRZAIC P ET AL, "44.3l: A PRINTED AND ROLLABLE BISTABLE ELECTRONIC DISPLAY", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS,US,SANTA ANA, CA: SID, (19980517), vol. 29, ISSN 0098-966X, XP002127322 [A] 1-205 | by applicant | WO9910767 |