|
28.02.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.09.2006 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2006 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2006 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.06.2006 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.10.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.12.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.06.2000 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.04.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.04.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.04.2000 |
PCT(IB): Amended sheet (Article 19) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |