|
06.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.09.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.2009 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.11.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.10.2006 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2006 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |