EP1125234 - A METHOD AND A DEVICE RELATING TO AN AUTOMATED EXCHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMX Technology AB 105 78 Stockholm / SE | [2004/50] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states OM Technology AB 105 78 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TILFORS, Jan Jung Atles väg 12 S-167 74 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
KATZ, Gary 3 Warren Place Plainview, NY 11803 / US | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/24] |
Former [2004/50] | Samzelius, Roger Mikael, et al OM Technology AB 105 78 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/11] | Sandström, Staffan Sven OM Technology AB S-105 78 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/34] | Rosenquist, Per Olof Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99957454.4 | 04.11.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999SE01995 | Priority number, date | US19980186155 | 05.11.1998 Original published format: US 186155 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0028450 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1125234 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, H04L12/18 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN BEZUG AUF AUTOMATISCHES WECHSELN | [2001/34] | English: | A METHOD AND A DEVICE RELATING TO AN AUTOMATED EXCHANGE | [2001/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF LIES A L'ECHANGE AUTOMATISE | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9315467 (FOREIGN EXCHANGE TRANSACTION S [US]) [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO9838844 (SUMMIT TELECOM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 | [X] - SCHMERKEN I, "THE PANDORA'S BOX OVER AUTOQUOTES (INDUSTRY TREND OR EVENT)", WALL STREET TECHNOLOGY, MILLER FREEMAN, US, US, (19970301), vol. 15, no. 03, ISSN 1060-989X, pages 01 - 03 [X] 1-10 | [A] - SALES R, "PLAY FAIR WITH THE LITTLE GUY (NEW SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSIONORDER-HANDLING RULES)(GOVERNMENT ACTIVITY)(COVER STORY)", WALL STREET TECHNOLOGY, MILLER FREEMAN, US, US, (19970101), vol. 15, no. 01, ISSN 1060-989X, pages 01 - 05 [A] 1-10 | [A] - SCHMERKEN I, "THE BULLS AND BEARS COME OUT AT NIGHT; ELECTRONIC TRADING (INCLUDESRELATED ARTICLE ON OFF-FLOOR BUSINESS IN EUROPE)", WALL STREET COMPUTER REVIEW., NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19900901), vol. 07, no. 12, pages 01 - 10 [A] 1-10 |