EP1145285 - HAND TOOL FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF SMALL, NOTABLY ELECTRONIC, COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tresky, Miroslav Rebbergstrasse 15 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Spicak-Malcova, Hana Mattackerstrasse 19 8052 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Spicak-Malcova, Hana Köschenrütistrasse 15 8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99957836.2 | 21.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999CH00614 | Priority number, date | CH19980002588 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: CH 258898 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0041218 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1145285 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145285 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
H01L21/6838 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | HANDWERKZEUG ZUR MONTAGE KLEINER, INSBESONDERE ELEKTRONISCHER BAUTEILE | [2001/42] | English: | HAND TOOL FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF SMALL, NOTABLY ELECTRONIC, COMPONENTS | [2001/42] | French: | OUTIL A MAIN POUR LE MONTAGE DE PETITS COMPOSANTS, EN PARTICULIER ELECTRONIQUES | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 14.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | IE | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | PT | 03.05.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | ES | 14.08.2006 | AT | 21.12.2006 | LU | 21.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2013/51] |
Former [2011/46] | CY | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
LU | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2009/02] | CY | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
LU | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
LU | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 03.08.2006 | |
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 03.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3721226 (FRITSCH ADALBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]CH673251 (MIROSLAV TRESKY DR ING) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9732460 (ALPHASEM AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2* page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 2-4 * |