|
18.10.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
12 |
|
26.03.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.10.2009 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
70 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Notice concerning a request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.11.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.10.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.01.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
22.12.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |