EP1139855 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A VISUAL FIELD TEST, AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR PROCESSING THE RESULTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEIJL, Anders Biskopsgatan 22 223 62 Lund / SE | For all designated states OLSSON, Jonny Bomvägen 20 226 51 Lund / SE | For all designated states BENGTSSON, Boel Fru Alstad, Stengarden 231 96 Trelleborg / SE | [2008/35] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states HEIJL, Anders Biskopsgatan 22 223 62 Lund / SE | ||
For all designated states OLSSON, Jonny Bomvägen 20 226 51 Lund / SE | |||
For all designated states Bengtsson, Boel Fru Alstad, Stengarden 231 96 Trelleborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 99965653.1 | 15.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999SE02365 | Priority number, date | SE19980004616 | 30.12.1998 Original published format: SE 9804616 | US19990114799P | 04.01.1999 Original published format: US 114799 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040140 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1139855 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1139855 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/024, G06F9/44 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A61B3/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2004/21] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES GESICHTFELDTESTES UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM VERARBEITEN DER RESULTATE DAVON | [2001/41] | English: | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A VISUAL FIELD TEST, AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR PROCESSING THE RESULTS THEREOF | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE REALISER UN TEST DU CHAMP VISUEL, ET PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEURS DESTINES A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2305515 (INTERZEAG AG [CH]); | [A]EP0363811 (ORVILLE GORDON); | [A]US5319398 (WEIJLAND ALBERT [CH]) |