|
07.03.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Text: Decision / Communication |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2010 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Communication: Transfer of procedural status |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2009 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.10.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
30 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2005 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.05.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.01.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.01.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.01.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.01.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.01.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.01.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
40 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |