EP1133444 - SWITCH POINT FOR FLAT, FLEXIBLE POSTAL ARTICLES IN SORTING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Production and Logistics Systems AG Gleiwitzer Strasse 555 90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2001/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Armin Mainaustrasse 196 B D-78464 Konstanz / DE | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. Siemens AG, Patentabteilung, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99970980.1 | 01.10.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999DE03167 | Priority number, date | DE1998149748 | 28.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19849748 | [2001/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024661 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133444 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133444 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/58, B07C3/06 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
B65H29/58 (EP,US);
B65H2301/321 (EP,US);
B65H2404/261 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/27] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | WEICH FÜR FLACHE, FLEXIBLE SENDUNGEN IN SENDUNGSSORTIERMASCHINEN | [2001/38] | English: | SWITCH POINT FOR FLAT, FLEXIBLE POSTAL ARTICLES IN SORTING MACHINES | [2001/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIGUILLAGE POUR OBJETS DE CORRESPONDANCE PLATS ET SOUPLES DANS LES MACHINES A TRIER | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5150894 (RICCIARDI MARIO [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 64 - column 8, line 14; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0255684 (CGA HBS [FR]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 40; figure - *; | [A]US4251000 (TEMPLETON WILLIAM B); | [A]GB2023104 (MOLINS MACHINE CO INC); | [A]DE4317042 (JAGENBERG AG [DE]) |