EP1065878 - SERIAL DIGITAL INTERFACE SYSTEM TRANSMISSION/RECEPTION METHOD AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Tomotaka 6-3-203 Myoukensaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0021 / JP | 02 /
Nishioka, Minoru 2-1-20-510 Uozakinishi-machi, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0026 / JP | 03 /
Wada, Noriaki 3-2-B-301 Kasugadai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2276 / JP | 04 /
Bannai, Tatsushi 389-12 Kitanoda Sakai-shi, Osaka 599-8123 / JP | 05 /
Murao, Tsugio 7-10-18 Shimaizumi Habikino-shi, Osaka 583-0081 / JP | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 99973369.4 | 06.12.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999JP06811 | Priority number, date | JP19980346488 | 07.12.1998 Original published format: JP 34648898 | JP19990050039 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: JP 5003999 | JP19990229672 | 16.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22967299 | [2001/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035189 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065878 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/38, H04N5/44, H04N5/222 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
H04N11/042 (EP,US);
H04N7/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Senden und Empfangen für eine serielle digitale Schnittstelle | [2001/01] | English: | SERIAL DIGITAL INTERFACE SYSTEM TRANSMISSION/RECEPTION METHOD AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2001/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EMISSION/RECEPTION POUR SYSTEME A INTERFACE SERIE NUMERIQUE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2000 | Translation filed | 04.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 03.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09214909 (SONY CORP); | [Y]US5734435 (WILSON PETER [GB], et al); | [X]JPH08265662 (SONY CORP); | [X]JPH09247667 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH06153207 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH05323928 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [A]JPH04271395 (SONY CORP) | [Y] - YUKIHIRO NISHIDA, "Digital Video Interface (1)", DIGITAL INTERFACE, TOKYO, (1997), vol. 51, no. 9, pages 1397 - 1403, XP002930130 |