EP2119458 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF RADIATION DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Medi-Physics Co., Ltd. 3-4-10 Shinsuna Koto-ku Tokyo 136-0075 / JP | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Daisaku c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Soichi c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | 03 /
TOYAMA, Masahito c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Akio c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | [2013/20] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Daisaku c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, Soichi c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | |||
03 /
TOYAMA, Masahito c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | |||
04 /
HAYASHI, Akio c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO. LTD. 3-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | Representative(s) | Kotitschke & Heurung Partnerschaft mbB Eduard-Schmid-Str. 2 81541 München / DE | [2014/14] |
Former [2013/09] | Kotitschke & Heurung Partnerschaft Eduard-Schmid-Str. 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08711095.3 | 12.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008JP52231 | Priority number, date | JP20070031692 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007031692 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008099800 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119458 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119458 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2119458 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/04, A61K47/10, C07C229/48, C07B59/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
C07C229/48 (EP,US);
A61K51/00 (KR);
A61K47/02 (KR);
A61K47/18 (KR);
A61K51/0402 (EP,US);
A61K51/0406 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
C07B59/001 (EP,US);
C07B63/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | A61K51/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/04, A61K47/10, C07C229/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABBILDUNGSMITTELS ZUR STRAHLENDIAGNOSE | [2009/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF RADIATION DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING AGENT | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN AGENT D'IMAGERIE DE DIAGNOSTIC PAR RAYONNEMENT | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2009 | Translation filed | 03.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2008 | AT | 15.05.2013 | BE | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | IE | 12.02.2014 | LU | 12.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.02.2008 | |
AT | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
LU | 12.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
PT | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1356827 (MALLINCKRODT INC [US]) [YD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004056725 (AMERSHAM PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 7, line 21 - line 25 * * claim 4 *; | [E]EP2106808 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * | International search | [A]JP2000500442 ; | [Y]WO2006037950 (GE HEALTHCARE LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2006134822 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US2006292073 (GOODMAN MARK M [US], et al); | [AP]WO2007132689 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y] - MCCONATHY J. ET AL., "IMPROVED SYNTHESIS OF ANTI-[18F] FACBC: IMPROVED PREPARATION F LABELING PRECURSOR AND AUTOMATED RADIOSYNTHESIS", APPL. RADIAT. ISOT., (2003), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 657 - 666, XP004429471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-8043(03)00029-0 | [A] - OKA S. ET AL., "A PRELIMINARY STUDY OF ANTI-1-AMINO-3-18F-FLUOROCYCLOBUTYL-1-CARBOXYLIC ACID FOR THE DETECTION OF PROSTATE CANCER", J. NUCL. MED., (200701), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 46 - 55, XP008111963 | by applicant | JPH10147542 | WO03090789 | WO2004043497 | JP2006304338 | WO2006134822 | - RADIOISOTOPES, (2001), vol. 50, pages 205 - 227 | - RADIOISOTOPES, (2001), vol. 50, pages 228 - 556 | - Production and quality control of radioactive agents for PET - Handbook of synthesis and clinical use, PET CHEMISTRY WORKSHOP |