blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2134374

EP2134374 - BTK INHIBITORS FOR USE IN TREATING CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC DRUG-RESISTANT EPITHELIAL TUMOURS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/52]SIRNA-MEDIATED SILENCING OF GENES FOR TREATING CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC DRUG-RESISTANT EPITHELIAL TUMOURS
[2013/21]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2014
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2014  [2014/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIONSIL S.R.L. IN LIQUIDAZIONE
Via Giuseppe Mazzini 2
20123 Milano / IT
[2014/13]
Former [2010/49]For all designated states
Bionsil S.r.l.
Via Giuseppe Mazzini, 2
Milano / IT
Former [2009/52]For all designated states
Università Degli Studi Di Milano - Bicocca
Piazza dell'Ateneo Nuovo, 1
20126 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / LAVITRANO, Marialuisa
viale Luigi Majno 10
I-20129 Milano / IT
02 / GRASSILLI, Emanuela
viale Libertà 159
I-20052 Monza / IT
03 / HELIN, Kristian
Fredens Plads 2
DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK
 [2009/52]
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Viale Achille Papa, 30
20149 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Gervasi, Gemma, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2010/22]Gervasi, Gemma, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2009/52]Susanetto, Carlo, et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
Application number, filing date08717840.614.03.2008
[2009/52]
WO2008EP53099
Priority number, dateIT2007PD0008814.03.2007         Original published format: IT PD20070088
EP2007010611913.04.2007         Original published format: EP 07106119
[2009/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008110624
Date:18.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2134374
Date:23.12.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2134374
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2008
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/113, C12Q1/68, C12N15/11, G01N33/50, A61P35/00
[2013/28]
CPC:
A61K31/519 (EP,US); A61K31/7105 (KR); A61K31/277 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US); A61K31/506 (EP,US); A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US); A61K31/713 (EP,US); A61K39/21 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); C12N15/111 (EP,US); C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/1137 (US); C12N15/1138 (EP,US); C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US); C12N2310/14 (EP,US); C12N2310/141 (US);
C12N2320/12 (EP,US); C12N2320/31 (US); C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/277, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
(-)
Former IPC [2013/21]C12N15/113, C12Q1/68, C12N15/11, G01N33/50
Former IPC [2009/52]A61K48/00, C12N15/11, G01N33/50, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/52]
Extension statesAL14.10.2009
BA14.10.2009
MK14.10.2009
RS14.10.2009
TitleGerman:BTK INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CHEMOTHERAPEUTIKA-RESISTENTE EPITHELZELLTUMOREN[2013/21]
English:BTK INHIBITORS FOR USE IN TREATING CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC DRUG-RESISTANT EPITHELIAL TUMOURS[2013/21]
French:INHIBITEURS DE LA BTK POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS ÉPITHÉLIALES pharmacorésistantes[2013/21]
Former [2009/52]SIRNA-VERMITTELTE DÄMPFUNG VON GENEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON EPITHELZELLTUMOREN, DIE GEGEN CHEMOTHERAPEUTIKA RESISTENT SIND
Former [2009/52]SIRNA-MEDIATED SILENCING OF GENES FOR TREATING CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC DRUG-RESISTANT EPITHELIAL TUMOURS
Former [2009/52]COMPOSES MODULATEURS DE LA PHARMACORESISTANCE DANS DES CELLULES TUMORALES EPITHELIALES
Entry into regional phase13.10.2009National basic fee paid 
13.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/52]
30.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
04.06.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2013Fee for grant paid
11.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12179801.1  / EP2550976
EP12179806.0  / EP2546651
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.08.2010
Opposition(s)21.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
09.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
11.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201104   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2011
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US6303652  (UCKUN FATIH M [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15-18,39-44 * fig. 13 column 3 lines 8-11 column 9 lines 26-31 column 10 paragraph 2 column 13 lines 47-58 column 15 lines 4-20 column 17 lines 27-36 *;
 [X]WO2005056766  (MEDIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,15-18,39-44 * paragraphs 15, 24, 26, 242, 246, 261, 266-268, 274 claims 1-16 page 112 lines 15-16 table 2 *;
 [A]WO2006041902  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0028]; example 5 *;
 [X]EP1662259  (CELLZOME AG [DE]) [X] 15 * claims 17,18 *;
 [X]WO2006063164  (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 15 * claims 1-9,12-21 *;
 [X]WO2006081418  (BURNHAM INST [US], et al) [X] 15,16 * paragraphs 7-9, 28, 50-52, 103, 105, 107, 110, 130 examples 1, 3, 4 *;
 [X]WO2006113679  (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [X] 15,16 * page 22 line 14-page 25 line 4 example 1 page 39 lines 14-21 page 51 line 30 - page 52 line 19 *;
 [A]  - BARTZ STEVEN R ET AL, "SMALL INTERFERING RNA SCREENS REVEAL ENHANCED CISPLATIN CYTOTOXICITY IN TUMOR CELLS HAVING BOTH BRCA NETWORK AND TP53 DISRUPTIONS", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, (20061201), vol. 26, no. 24, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 9377 - 9386, XP009077057 [A] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.01229-06
 [X]  - LEVIN P A ET AL, "Liposomal delivery of EphA2 siRNA in combination with gemcitabine reduces pancreatic tumor growth and invasion", PANCREAS, & 37TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-PANCREATIC-ASSOCIATION/13TH MEETING OF THE INTERNATIONAL-ASSOCIA; CHICAGO, IL, USA; NOVEMBER 01 04, 2006, (200611), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0885-3177, page 477, XP002502047 [X] 15-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006676-200611000-00139
 [X]  - LANDEN CHARLES N JR ET AL, "Therapeutic EphA2 gene targeting in vivo using neutral liposomal small interfering RNA delivery", CANCER RESEARCH, (200508), vol. 65, no. 15, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6910 - 6918, XP002502048 [X] 15,16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-0530
 [X]  - MAO WEIGUANG ET AL, "EphB2 as a therapeutic antibody drug target for the treatment of colorectal cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, USA, DE, (20040201), vol. 64, no. 3, pages 781 - 788, XP002343724 [X] 1-4,7-11,15-18,39-44 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-03-1047
 [Y]  - SHAKOORI ET AL, "Deregulated GSK3beta activity in colorectal cancer: Its association with tumor cell survival and proliferation", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20050909), vol. 334, no. 4, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1365 - 1373, XP005001539 [Y] 1-11,14-18,39-44 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2005.07.041
 [Y]  - DE TONI F ET AL, "A crosstalk between the Wnt and the adhesion-dependent signaling pathways governs the chemosensitivity of acute myeloid leukemia", ONCOGENE, (200605), vol. 25, no. 22, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 3113 - 3122, XP002502049 [Y] 1-11,14-18,39-44 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1209346
 [X]  - TAN JING ET AL, "Pharmacologic modulation of glycogen synthase kinase-3 beta promotes p53-dependent apoptosis through a direct bax-mediated mitochondrial pathway in colorectal cancer cells", CANCER RESEARCH, (200510), vol. 65, no. 19, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 9012 - 9020,8993, XP002502050 [X] 1-11,14-18,39-44 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-1226
 [X]  - UCKUN FATIH M ET AL, "In vivo pharmacokinetic features, toxicity profile, and chemosensitizing activity of alpha-cyano-beta-hydroxy-beta- methyl-N-(2,5-dibromophenyl)propenamide (LFM-A13), a novel antileukemic agent targeting Bruton's tyrosine kinase.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH MAY 2002, (200205), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1224 - 1233, XP002502051 [X] 1-13,15-18,39-44 * abstract *
 [X]  - UCKUN ET AL, "Anti-breast cancer activity of LFM-A13, a potent inhibitor of Polo-like kinase (PLK)", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (20061212), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 800 - 814, XP005882800 [X] 15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2006.10.050
 [AP]  - "Colorectal Cancer", THE MERCK MANUAL, (200712), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.merck.com/mmpe/print/sec02/ch021/ch021h.html, (20081030), XP002502052 [AP] * page 3 paragraphs 3, 7 *
 [A]  - "Modalities of Cancer Therapy", THE MERCK MANUAL, (200511), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.merck.com/mmpe/print/sec11/ch149/ch149b.html, (20081030), XP002502053 [A] * page 4 paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - HAFNER C ET AL, "Expression profile of Eph receptors and ephrin ligands in human skin and downregulation of EphA1 in nonmelanoma skin cancer", MODERN PATHOLOGY 20061021 GB, (20061021), vol. 19, no. 10, ISSN 0893-3952 1530-0285, pages 1369 - 1377, XP002487739

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/modpathol.3800660
 [AP]  - MASUDA JUNKO ET AL, "Fibronectin type I repeat is a nonactivating ligand for EphA1 and inhibits ATF3-dependent angiogenesis.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 9 MAY 2008, (20080509), vol. 283, no. 19, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13148 - 13155, XP002487740

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M702164200
 [A]  - SURAWSKA H ET AL, "The role of ephrins and Eph receptors in cancer", CYTOKINE AND GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, OXFORD, GB, (20041201), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 1359-6101, pages 419 - 433, XP004652022

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cytogfr.2004.09.002
 [L]  - MAYES PATRICK A ET AL, "Overcoming drug resistance of hypoxic cancer cells and tumors via stabilization of c-Myc protein through inhibition of GSK3 beta", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, (20080401), vol. 49th, ISSN 0197-016X, page 641, XP001538924 [L] 1-11,15-18,39-44 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.