blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2132562

EP2132562 - METHODS OF EVALUATING CELLS AND CELL CULTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2012
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genzyme Corporation
500 Kendall Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2009/51]
Inventor(s)01 / RAPKO, Stephen, M.
12 Island Road
Franklin, MA 02038 / US
02 / DUGUAY, Stephen, J.
117 Federal Street
Salem, MA 01970 / US
 [2009/51]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2009/51]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08733105.403.04.2008
[2009/51]
WO2008US59275
Priority number, dateUS20070910574P06.04.2007         Original published format: US 910574 P
[2009/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008124508
Date:16.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2132562
Date:16.12.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2132562
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2132562
Date:23.05.2012
[2012/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.10.2008
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/50, G01N33/68
[2009/51]
CPC:
G01N33/5044 (EP,KR,US); G01N33/6887 (EP,KR,US); C12Q1/6844 (KR);
C12Q1/6851 (KR); G01N2333/4722 (EP,KR,US); G01N2400/40 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2800/10 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON ZELLEN UND ZELLKULTUREN[2009/51]
English:METHODS OF EVALUATING CELLS AND CELL CULTURES[2009/51]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION DE CELLULES ET DE CULTURES DE CELLULES[2009/51]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2009National basic fee paid 
02.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/51]
12.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2011Fee for grant paid
29.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11188198.3  / EP2442104
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2010
Opposition(s)12.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
LU03.04.2012
BG11.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]CY11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2013/35]CY11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/50]CY11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/49]CY11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/48]CY11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/41]CY11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/35]BG11.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/34]IS11.05.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2006094836  (EPIONTIS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 60 - page 63; example 3 * * claims 1,2,5-7,9 *;
 [A]  - STOKES ET AL, "Assessment of the gene expression profile of differentiated and dedifferentiated human fetal chondrocytes by microarray analysis", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, LIPPINCOTT, PHILADELPHIA, US, (20020201), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 404 - 419, XP002253145 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 405, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 411, column R; table 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10106
 [A]  - MARLOVITS S ET AL, "Differential gene-expression of human articular chondrocytes and human fibroblasts in two- and three-dimensional cell culture", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, (20010307), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 0892-6638, page A34, XP008021552 [A] 1-35 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.00-0237rev
 [A]  - KOLETTAS E ET AL, "Expression of cartilage-specific molecules is retained on long-term culture of human articular chondrocytes", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19950501), vol. 108, no. PART 5, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 1991 - 1999, XP002465823 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * * abstract * * figures 3-5 *
 [T]  - RAPKO ET AL, "P195 Identification of dedifferentiated chondrocytes using gene expression - the dsc assay", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, BAILLIERE TINDALL,, LONDON, GB, (20070905), vol. 15, ISSN 1063-4584, page B137, XP022221713 [T] 1-35 * the whole document *
Examination   - BRITTBERG M ET AL, "Treatment of deep cartilage defects in the knee with autologous chondrocyte transplantation.", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 6 OCT 1994 LNKD- PUBMED:8078550, (19941006), vol. 331, no. 14, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 889 - 895
by applicantWO2006094836
    - BASAD ET AL., Cartilage Surgery and Future Perspectives, THIEME VERLAG, (2003), pages 49 - 56
    - BRITTBERG ET AL., NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1994), vol. 331, no. 14, pages 889 - 895
    - BRITTBERG ET AL., CLIN. ORTHOPAED. REL. RES., (1999), vol. 367S, pages S147 - S155
    - STOKES ET AL., ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (2002), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 404 - 419
    - MARLOVITS ET AL., FASEB JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 15, no. 4, page A34
    - KOLETTAS ET AL., J. OF CELL SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 108, pages 1991 - 1999
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.