blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2164514

EP2164514 - ANTIBODIES TO IL-6 AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AlderBio Holdings LLC
101 Convention Center Drive, Suite 850
Las Vegas, NV 89109 / US
[2015/16]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
AlderBio Holdings LLC
101 Convention Center Drive, Suite 850
Las Vegas, NV 89109 / US
For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
Former [2011/49]For all designated states
AlderBio Holdings LLC
101 Convention Center Drive, Suite 850
Las Vegas, NV 89109 / US
Former [2010/12]For all designated states
ALDER BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
11804 North Creek Parkway South
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GARCIA-MARTINEZ, Leon
4926 214th Street S.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / JENSEN, Anne, Elisabeth Carvalho
12401 Marine View Drive
Edmonds, WA 98026 / US
03 / OLSON, Katie
6700 NE 182nd Street, D207
Kenmore, WA 98028 / US
04 / DUTZAR, Ben
2422 Dexter Avenue, N., 103
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
05 / OJALA, Ethan
520 Avenue C
Snohomish, WA 98290 / US
06 / LATHAM, John
2409 10th Avenue, N.W.
Seattle, WA 98119 / US
07 / KOVACEVICH, Brian
13916 233rd Street, SE
Snohomish, WA 98296 / US
08 / SMITH, Jeffrey, T.l.
9907 156th Place, NE
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2016/50]
Former [2010/22]01 / GARCIA-MARTINEZ, Leon
4926 214th Street S.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / JENSEN, Anne, Elisabeth Carvalho
12401 Marine View Drive
Edmonds, WA 98026 / US
03 / OLSON, Katie
6700 NE 182nd Street, D207
Kenmore, WA 98028 / US
04 / DUTZAR, Ben
2422 Dexter Avenue, N., 103
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
05 / OJALA, Ethan
520 Avenue C
Snohomish, WA 98290 / US
06 / LATHAM, John
2409 10th Avenue, N.W.
Seattle, WA 98119 / US
07 / KOVACEVICH, Brian
13916 233rd Street, SE
Snohomish, WA 98296 / US
08 / SMITH, Jeffrey, T.l.
9907 156th Place, NE
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Former [2010/21]01 / GARCIA-MARTINEZ, Leon
4926 214th Street S.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / JENSEN, Anne, Elisabeth Carvalho
12401 Marine View Drive
Edmonds Washington 98026 / US
03 / OLSON, Katie
6700 NE 182nd Street, D207
Kenmore Washington 98028 / US
04 / DUTZAR, Ben
2422 Dexter Avenue, N., 103
Seattle Washington 98109 / US
05 / OJALA, Ethan
520 Avenue C
Snohomish Washington 98290 / US
06 / LATHAM, John
2409 10th Avenue, N.W.
Seattle Washington 98119 / US
07 / KOVACEVICH, Brian
13916 233rd Street, SE
Snohomish Washington 98296 / US
08 / SMITH, Jeffrey, T.l.
9907 156th Place, NE
Redmond Washington 98052 / US
Former [2010/12]01 / GARCIA-MARTINEZ, Leon
4926 214th Street S.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / JENSEN, Anne, Elisabeth Carvalho
12401 Marine View Drive
Edmonds, Washington 98026 / US
03 / OLSON, Katie
6700 NE 182nd Street, D207
Kenmore, Washington 98028 / US
04 / DUTZAR, Ben
2422 Dexter Avenue, N., 103
Seattle, Washington 98109 / US
05 / OJALA, Ethan
2529 200th Place, SW
Lynwood, Washington 98036 / US
06 / LATHAM, John
2409 10th Avenue, N.W.
Seattle, Washington 98119 / US
07 / KOVACEVICH, Brian
13916 233rd Street, SE
Snohomish, Washington 98296 / US
08 / SMITH, Jeffrey, T.l.
9907 156th Place, NE
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2010/12]Baldock, Sharon Claire
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date08756095.921.05.2008
[2010/12]
WO2008US64432
Priority number, dateUS20070924550P21.05.2007         Original published format: US 924550 P
[2010/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008144763
Date:27.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2164514
Date:24.03.2010
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2164514
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.01.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2012
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/24, A61K39/395
[2012/34]
CPC:
C07K16/248 (EP,IL,KR,NO,US); A61K39/3955 (IL,NO,US); C07K16/24 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR); A61K45/06 (IL,NO,US); A61K49/00 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP); A61P1/14 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP); A61P11/16 (EP); A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP); A61P15/00 (EP); A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP); A61P17/06 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP); A61P19/10 (EP); A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/24 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP); A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP); A61P3/10 (EP); A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP); A61P31/20 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP); A61P35/04 (EP); A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP); A61P37/06 (EP); A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP); A61P7/06 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP); C12N15/81 (KR); A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/20 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/50 (KR); C07K2317/567 (KR);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/92 (KR); C07K2317/94 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Former IPC [2010/12]A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/50]
Former [2010/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN IL-6 UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2010/12]
English:ANTIBODIES TO IL-6 AND USE THEREOF[2010/12]
French:ANTICORPS ANTI-IL-6 ET LEUR UTILISATION[2010/12]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2009National basic fee paid 
18.12.2009Search fee paid 
18.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/12]
26.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2016Fee for grant paid
31.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16195797.2  / EP3187506
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2013
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004039826  (CENTOCOR INC [US]);
 [X]WO2006119115  (CENTOCOR INC [US], et al);
 [XPY]WO2007104529  (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al);
International search[A]WO03045318  (CELLTECH R & D INC [US], et al);
 [X]US2006188502  (GILES-KOMAR JILL [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006257407  (CHEN YAN [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007048300  (TAYLOR FREDERICK R [US], et al)
ExaminationWO2004048552
 WO2006020266
 US2009291077
by applicantUS4816567
 US5202422
 US5225539
 US5530101
 US5585089
 US5624659
 US5627052
 US5693762
 US5959177
 US6054297
 US6180370
 US6187287
 US6407213
 US6548640
 US6632927
 US6639055
 US6653104
 WO2006119115
 US2006270045
 US20060801412
 US20070924550
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.