blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2219452

EP2219452 - METHODS OF TREATING SCLERODERMA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MedImmune, LLC
One MedImmune Way
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
[2010/34]
Inventor(s)01 / COYLE, Anthony
1155 23rd Street
Washington, DC 20037 / US
 [2015/42]
Former [2010/34]01 / COYLE, Anthony
1155 23rd Street
Washington DC 20037 / US
Representative(s)Winter, Christopher Spencer
MedImmune Limited
Milstein Building
Granta Park
Cambridge
CB21 6GH / GB
[2015/42]
Former [2011/44]Winter, Christopher Spencer
Medlmmune Limited
Milstein Building
Granta Park
Cambridge
CB21 6GH / GB
Former [2010/34]Bates, Rosica Florence
Medlmmune Ltd. Milstein Building Granta Park
Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB
Application number, filing date08847680.905.11.2008
[2010/34]
WO2008US82481
Priority number, dateUS20070996175P05.11.2007         Original published format: US 996175 P
US20080100454P26.09.2008         Original published format: US 100454 P
[2015/21]
Former [2010/37]US20070996175P05.11.2007
US2008010045426.09.2008
Former [2010/34]US20070996175P05.11.2007
US2008010054526.09.2008
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009061818
Date:14.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2219452
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2219452
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2012
ClassificationIPC:A01N43/54, A61K39/395, C07K16/24
[2012/18]
CPC:
C07K16/249 (EP,US); A61P13/12 (EP); A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP); A61P29/02 (EP); A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2010/34]A01N43/54
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/42]
Former [2010/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SKLERODERM[2010/34]
English:METHODS OF TREATING SCLERODERMA[2010/34]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLÉRODERMIE[2010/34]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2010National basic fee paid 
04.06.2010Search fee paid 
04.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/34]
26.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2015Fee for grant paid
03.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.10.2013
Opposition(s)15.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2016/27]
Former [2016/25]LV14.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005067963  (INTERMUNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0144] *;
 [A]WO2007002096  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 7 - page 8 * * page 21, line 4 *;
 [A]US2007092890  (ABBAS ALEXANDER [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0008] *;
 [IP]  - MACDERMOTT EMMA JANE ET AL, "Activation of type I interferon pathway in patients with systemic sclerosis (SSc) is associated with diffuse disease, antibodies to Ro and absence of Caucasian race", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 71ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOGY; BOSTON, MA, USA; NOVEMBER 06 -11, 2007, (200712), vol. 56, no. 12, ISSN 0004-3591, page 4244, XP009157116 [IP] 1-12 * abstract *
International search[Y]US6333032  (SKURKOVICH BORIS [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003088884  (HSU SHEAU YU [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004265305  (VAISHNAW AKSHAY K [US]);
 [X]US2007092890  (ABBAS ALEXANDER [US])
by applicantUS3773919
 US4444887
 WO8403105
 EP0119476
 US4485045
 US4544545
 WO8605807
 EP0239400
 US4716111
 WO8901036
 US4816567
 US4816397
 US4885166
 US4902618
 WO9002809
 WO9101074
 US5013556
 WO9109967
 WO9110737
 WO9201047
 US5122464
 WO9218619
 WO9222324
 EP0519596
 WO9311236
 US5223409
 US5225539
 WO9317105
 EP0592106
 US5403484
 US5413923
 WO9515982
 US5427908
 WO9520401
 US5516637
 US5530101
 US5545806
 US5565332
 US5569825
 WO9634096
 WO9633735
 US5571698
 US5580717
 US5585089
 WO9713844
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5658727
 US5661016
 US5698426
 US5733743
 WO9816654
 US5750753
 WO9824893
 US5766886
 US5780225
 US5807715
 US5814318
 US5821047
 WO9846645
 WO9850433
 US5939598
 US5969108
 US6311415
 US6407213
 US6713609
 US2006020118
 US2006029601
 US7087726
 US2006198840
 US2007014724
 WO2008070137
 WO2008070135
    - VARGA; ABRAHAM, J. CLIN. INVEST., (2007), vol. 117, pages 557 - 567
    - THEOFILOPOULOS AN; BACCALA R; BEUTLER B; KONO DH., "Type I Interferons (?/?) in immunity and autoimmunity.", IMMUNOL REV., (200504), vol. 204, pages 9 - 26
    - UZE ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 60, page 225
    - NOVICK ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 77, page 391
    - STARK GR; KERR IM; WILLIAMS BR; SILVERMAN RH; SCHREIBER RD., ANNU REV BIOCHEM, (1998), vol. 67, pages 227 - 64
    - THEOFILOPOULOS AN; BACCALA R; BEUTLER B; KONO DH., "Type I Interferons (a/b) in immunity and autoimmunity.", IMMUNOL REV., (200504), vol. 204, pages 9 - 26
    - BELARDELLI F; GRESSER I., "The neglected role of type I interferon in the T-cell response: implications for its clinical use.", IMMUNOL TODAY, (1996), vol. 17, pages 369 - 72
    - BANCHEREAU J; PASCUAL V; PALUCKA AK., "Autoimmunity through cytokine-induced dendritic cell activiation", IMMUNITY, (200405), vol. 20, pages 539 - 550
    - TAKI S. CYTOKINE, GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 13, pages 379 - 391
    - MAILLIARD RB; SON YI; REDLINGER R; COATES PT; GIERMASZ A; MOREL PA; STORKUS WJ; KALINSKI P, J IMMUNOL., (20030901), vol. 171, no. 5, pages 2366 - 73
    - FURST ET AL., J. OF RHEUMATOLOGY, (2007), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 1194 - 1200
    - CZIRJAK ET AL., ANN RHEUM DIS., (20070118), vol. 66, no. 7, pages 966 - 9
    - BRENNAN ET AL., BR J RHEUMATOL., (1992), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 457 - 60
    - MERKEL ET AL., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2002), vol. 46, no. 9, pages 2410 - 2420
    - WOOLDRIDGE ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 89, no. 8, page 2994 2998
    - BRINKMAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 182, pages 41 - 50
    - AMES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 184, pages 177 - 186
    - KETTLEBOROUGH ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 952 - 958
    - PERSIC ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 187, pages 9 - 18
    - BURTON ET AL., ADVANCES IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280
    - MULLINAX ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 864 - 869
    - SAWAI ET AL., AJRI, (1995), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34
    - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043
    - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 1202
    - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214
    - GILLIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202
    - PADLAN, MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4/5, pages 489 - 498
    - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814
    - ROGUSKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973
    - TAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 169, pages 1119 - 25
    - CALDAS ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (2000), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 353 - 60
    - MOREA ET AL., METHODS, (2000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 267 - 79
    - BACA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 16, pages 10678 - 84
    - ROGUSKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1996), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 895 - 904
    - COUTO ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5973S - 5977S
    - COUTO ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 8, pages 1717 - 22
    - SANDHU J S, GENE, (1994), vol. 150, no. 2, pages 409 - 10
    - PEDERSEN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 235, no. 3, pages 959 - 73
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323
    - KUTMEJER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 17, page 242
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO.
    - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 3688
    - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4030
    - MARTIN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, page 286 288
    - GABIZON ET AL., J. NATIONAL CANCER INST., (1989), page 1484
 US20080941004
 US20080696208
 US20050157494
 US20070909232
 US20070909117
 US20080034618
 US20080049970
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.