blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2229172

EP2229172 - TICAGRELOR FOR TREATMENT OF ABDOMINAL AORTIC ANEURYSMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/38]TRIAZOLO [4,5-D] PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS FOR TREATMENT OF ABDOMINAL AORTIC ANEURYSMS
[2014/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
???moredetails.lapse.edited??? MC
published on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2010/38]
Inventor(s)01 / MICHEL, Jean-Baptiste
INSERM Unit 698
CHU Bichat
Claude Bernard
46 Rue Henri Huchard
F-75018 Paris / FR
 [2014/37]
Former [2010/38]01 / MICHEL, Jean-Baptiste
INSERM Unit 698 CHU Bichat Claude Bernard 46 Rue Henri Huchard
F-75018 Paris / FR
Representative(s)Berry, Ian Gordon, et al
AstraZeneca
Intellectual Property
Milstein Building
Granta Park
Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Berry, Ian Gordon, et al
AstraZeneca
Global Intellectual Property
Patents
Mereside - Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
Former [2010/38]Berry, Ian Gordon, et al
AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property Patents Mereside - Alderley Park
GB-Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
Application number, filing date08857354.802.12.2008
[2010/38]
WO2008SE51386
Priority number, dateEP2007030161603.12.2007         Original published format: EP 07301616
[2010/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009072967
Date:11.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2229172
Date:22.09.2010
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2229172
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE11.06.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2012
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/519, A61P9/00, A61P9/10
[2010/38]
CPC:
A61K31/519 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP); A61P9/14 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/38]
Extension statesAL05.07.2010
BA05.07.2010
MK05.07.2010
RS05.07.2010
TitleGerman:TICAGRELOR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BAUCHAORTENANEURYSMEN[2014/18]
English:TICAGRELOR FOR TREATMENT OF ABDOMINAL AORTIC ANEURYSMS[2014/18]
French:TICAGRELOR POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ANÉVRYSMES AORTIQUES ABDOMINAUX[2014/18]
Former [2010/38]TRIAZOLO [4,5-D]PYRIMIDIN-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BAUCHAORTENANEURYSMEN
Former [2010/38]TRIAZOLO [4,5-D] PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS FOR TREATMENT OF ABDOMINAL AORTIC ANEURYSMS
Former [2010/38]COMPOSÉS DE TRIAZOLO [4,5-D] PYRIMIDINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ANÉVRYSMES AORTIQUES ABDOMINAUX
Entry into regional phase05.07.2010National basic fee paid 
05.07.2010Search fee paid 
05.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/38]
07.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2014Fee for grant paid
29.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2013
Opposition(s)11.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC10.09.2014
[2016/27]
Former [2015/18]deleted
Former [2015/12]LV10.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2009007675  (CARDOZ AB [SE], et al) [E] 1-8* page 44, lines 32-33 - page 45; example 19 *;
 [XY]  - R.T. OWEN ET AL, "AZD6140", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (20070101), vol. 32, no. 10, doi:10.1358/dof.2007.032.10.1133832, ISSN 0377-8282, page 845, XP055024216 [X] 1-8 * abstract * [Y] 1-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2007.032.10.1133832
 [Y]  - ETANI H ET AL, "[Platelet accumulation in abdominal aortic aneurysms and the effect of antiplatelet drugs: assessment by indium platelet scintigraphy].", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199206), Database accession no. NLM1640649, XP002687010 [Y] 1-8 * abstract *
    [ ] - KAKU IGAKU. THE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE JUN 1992, (199206), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0022-7854, pages 651 - 657
 [Y]  - LLOYD G M ET AL, "Patients with abdominal aortic aneurysm: Are we missing the opportunity for cardiovascular risk reduction?", JOURNAL OF VASCULAR SURGERY, C.V. MOSBY CO., ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (20041001), vol. 40, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JVS.2004.06.039, ISSN 0741-5214, pages 691 - 697, XP004584815 [Y] 1-8 * page 691, paragraphs 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jvs.2004.06.039
 [A]  - DIEHM N ET AL, "Current evidence and prospects for medical treatment of abdominal aortic aneurysms", VASA, (200511), vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 0301-1526, pages 217 - 223, XP009164626 [A] 1-8 * part with heading "Drug Treatment"; page 219 - page 221 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1024/0301-1526.34.4.217
International search[A]WO9703084  (ASTRA PHARMA PROD [GB], et al);
 [A]WO9905143  (ASTRA PHARMA PROD [GB], et al);
 [X]WO0034283  (ASTRAZENECA UK LTD [GB], et al);
 [X]WO0192262  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al);
 [X]WO02096428  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al);
 [X]EP1493745  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]);
 [X]US2007265282  (HARDERN DAVID [GB], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.