EP2103521 - High speed packaging group and packaging machine equipped with such group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SITMA MACHINERY S.p.A. Via Vignolese, 1910 41057 Spilamberto (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states SITMA MACHINERY S.p.A. Via Vignolese 1910 41057 Spilamberto (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states SITMA S.p.A. Via Vignolese 1910 41057 Spilamberto-Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballestrazzi, Aris Via Castello, 14/1 41056 Savignano sul Panaro (Modena) / IT | 02 /
Tassi, Lamberto Via Castello, 14/2 41056 Savignano sul Panaro (Modena) / IT | [2011/09] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Ballestrazzi, Aris Via Castello 14/1 41056 Savignano sul Panaro (Modena) / IT | ||
02 /
Tassi, Lamberto Via Castello 14/2 41056 Savignano sul Panaro (Modena) / IT | Representative(s) | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/39] | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09154455.1 | 05.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | IT2008MI00392 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: IT MI20080392 | [2009/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2103521 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2103521 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103521 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/02, B65B25/14, B65B51/16, B65B51/26 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/43121 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/8161 (EP,US);
B29C66/83421 (EP,US);
B29C66/83511 (EP,US);
B29C66/83517 (EP,US);
B29C66/849 (EP);
B65B25/145 (EP,US);
B65B51/16 (EP,US);
B65B51/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | Hochgeschwindigkeitsverpackungsgruppe und mit solch einer Gruppe ausgestattete Verpackungsmaschine | [2009/39] | English: | High speed packaging group and packaging machine equipped with such group | [2009/39] | French: | Groupe d'emballage haute vitesse et machine d'emballage équipée d'un tel groupe | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2012
18.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH Opponent's representative Rentsch Partner AG, et al, et al Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2012
18.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH Opponent's representative Rentsch Partner AG, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | 21.05.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.11.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2014 | 09.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.08.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | LI | 13.07.2011 | LT | 13.07.2011 | LV | 13.07.2011 | MK | 13.07.2011 | MT | 13.07.2011 | IS | 13.11.2011 | LU | 05.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | HR | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | HU | 06.03.2014 | SI | 06.03.2014 | [2015/14] |
Former [2015/12] | CH | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
HU | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CH | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CH | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 13.07.2011 | |
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 13.07.2011 | |
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 13.07.2011 | |
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 13.07.2011 | |
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 13.07.2011 | |
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1502854 (SITMA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-8,11,15,17-19 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026]; figure - * [A] 9,10; | [A]US2006042759 (HONEGGER WERNER [CH]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [YA]US2007209323 (HONEGGER WERNER [CH]) [Y] 1-8,11,15,17-19 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-8 * [A] 9,10 | by applicant | EP1502854 |