blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2262493

EP2262493 - METHODS OF TREATMENT EMPLOYING PROLONGED CONTINUOUS INFUSION OF BELINOSTAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2016
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Onxeo DK, branch of Onxeo S.A., France
Symbion Science Park
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
[2015/16]
Former [2010/51]For all designated states
Topotarget A/S
Symbion Science Park Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
Inventor(s)01 / SEHESTED, Maxwell
TopoTarget A/S
Symbion Science Park
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
02 / JENSEN, Peter Buhl
TopoTarget A/S
Symbion Science Park
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
03 / NISSEN, Nis
TopoTarget A/S
Symbion Science Park
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
 [2015/09]
Former [2010/51]01 / SEHESTED, Maxwell
TopoTarget A/S Symbion Science Park Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
02 / JENSEN, Peter Buhl
TopoTarget A/S Symbion Science Park Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
03 / NISSEN, Nis
TopoTarget A/S Symbion Science Park Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen / DK
Representative(s)Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/09]Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2010/51]Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date09717048.406.03.2009
[2010/51]
WO2009IB05044
Priority number, dateUS20080034635P07.03.2008         Original published format: US 34635 P
[2010/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009109861
Date:11.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2262493
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2262493
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.2009
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/18, A61K47/18, A61P35/00
[2010/51]
CPC:
A61K31/18 (EP,US); A61K47/18 (EP,US); A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/02 (EP); Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/51]
Extension statesAL28.09.2010
BA28.09.2010
RS28.09.2010
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN MIT LÄNGERER KONTINUIERLICHER INFUSION VON BELINOSTAT[2010/51]
English:METHODS OF TREATMENT EMPLOYING PROLONGED CONTINUOUS INFUSION OF BELINOSTAT[2010/51]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT EMPLOYANT UNE PERFUSION CONTINUE PROLONGÉE DE BELINOSTAT[2010/51]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2010National basic fee paid 
28.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/51]
02.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
05.01.2015Fee for grant paid
05.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2011
Opposition(s)26.11.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
05.01.2015Request for further processing filed
05.01.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.01.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.10.2012Request for further processing filed
10.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.03.2009
BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
MK25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
TR25.02.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU06.03.2009
BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
TR25.02.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2017/03]HR25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/49]HR25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/38]HR25.02.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/37]HR25.02.2015
GR26.05.2015
Former [2015/36]HR25.02.2015
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2006120456  (TOPOTARGET UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,9-29,36-56,63-81 * example 2 * * claim - * [Y] 1-81;
 [XY]  - STEELE NICOLA L ET AL, "A phase 1 pharmacokinetic and pharmacodynamic study of the histone deacetylase inhibitor belinostat in patients with advanced solid tumors.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH 1 FEB 2008, (20080201), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 804 - 810, XP002531593 [X] 1,2,9-29,36-56,63-81 * abstract * [Y] 1-81

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-1786
 [PX]  - GIMSING PETER, "Belinostat: a new broad acting antineoplastic histone deacetylase inhibitor.", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS APR 2009, (200904), vol. 18, no. 4, ISSN 1744-7658, pages 501 - 508, XP002531594 [PX] 1-7,9-34,36-61,63-81 * abstract * * page 504, column L, paragraphs 5,6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543780902852560
 [PX]  - GIMSING PETER ET AL, "A phase I clinical trial of the histone deacetylase inhibitor belinostat in patients with advanced hematological neoplasia.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY SEP 2008, (200809), vol. 81, no. 3, ISSN 1600-0609, pages 170 - 176, XP002531595 [PX] 1,2,9-29,36-56,63-81 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0609.2008.01102.x
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.