blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2281037

EP2281037 - FACTOR VII POLYPEPTIDES THAT ARE MODIFIED AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Catalyst Biosciences, Inc.
260 Littlefield Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2011/06]
Inventor(s)01 / MADISON, Edwin, L.
558 48th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94121 / US
02 / THANOS, Christopher
3579 Sacramento Street
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
 [2013/34]
Former [2011/06]01 / MADISON, Edwin, L.
555 48th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94121 / US
02 / THANOS, Christopher
3579 Sacramento Street
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2011/06]Baldock, Sharon Claire
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date09730852.210.04.2009
[2011/06]
WO2009US02248
Priority number, dateUS20080124021P11.04.2008         Original published format: US 124021 P
[2011/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2009126307
Date:15.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2281037
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2281037
Date:11.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.2009
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/64
[2011/06]
CPC:
C12N9/6437 (EP,CN,US); A61P7/04 (EP); C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21021 (EP,CN,US); A61K38/00 (EP,CN,US); A61K48/00 (US);
C07K2319/00 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/46]
Former [2011/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL11.11.2010
BA11.11.2010
RS11.11.2010
TitleGerman:FAKTOR-VII-POLYPEPTIDE MIT MODIFIKATIONEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2011/06]
English:FACTOR VII POLYPEPTIDES THAT ARE MODIFIED AND USES THEREOF[2011/06]
French:POLYPEPTIDES FACTEUR VII MODIFIÉS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2011/06]
Entry into regional phase11.11.2010National basic fee paid 
11.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/06]
25.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2015Fee for grant paid
30.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13162166.6  / EP2687596
EP13162174.0  / EP2679678
EP16159675.4  / EP3064580
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.03.2011
Opposition(s)12.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.09.2013Request for further processing filed
09.09.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.10.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
23.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
MT30.04.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/29]CY11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
Former [2016/36]EE11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
Former [2016/25]HR11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
Former [2016/23]HR11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
Former [2016/20]LT11.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0158935  (MAXYGEN APS [DK]) [A] 1-20,52-64,78-168* the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007022512  (NEOSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20,52-64,78-168 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2007031559  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-20,52-64,78-168 * see whole document and in particular p. 15, first paragraph, p.38, l.19-24 and p.68. *;
 [Y]US2007117756  (HAANING JESPER M [DK], et al) [Y] 53-64 * the whole document *;
 [PXY]WO2008090215  (NOVO NORDISK HEALTHCARE AG [CH], et al) [PX] 21-26,52-64,78-168 * see whole document and in particular paragraphs [0019, 0074-0078] and claims 7 and 8. * * same passages * [PY] 53-64;
 [X]  - BJELKE ET AL, "A loop of coagulation factor VIIa influencing macromolecular substrate specificity", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20061223), vol. 581, no. 1, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 71 - 76, XP005815646 [X] 1-5,7-12,14-20,52-64,78-168 * abstract * * page 73 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2006.11.079
 [X]  - DICKINSON C D ET AL, "Identification of surface residues mediating tissue factor binding and catalytic function of the serine protease factor VIIa", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (19961201), vol. 93, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14379 - 14384, XP002267001 [X] 1,4-6,52-64,78-168 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.25.14379
 [A]  - PERSSON E ET AL, "RATIONAL DESIGN OF COAGULATION FACTOR VLLA VARIANTS WITH SUBSTANTIALLY INCREASED INTRINSIC ACTIVITY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (20011120), vol. 98, no. 24, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13583 - 13588, XP002909203 [A] 1-20,52-64,78-168 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.241339498
 [A]  - ALLEN GEOFFREY A ET AL, "A variant of recombinant factor VIIa with enhanced procoagulant and antifibrinolytic activities in an in vitro model of hemophilia", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS THROMBOSIS AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (200703), vol. 27, no. 3, ISSN 1079-5642, pages 683 - 689, XP002538665 [A] 1-20,52-64,78-168 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.ATV.0000257204.82396.2B
by applicantUS5033352
 US5052558
 US5323907
 US6017882
 WO0132711
 US2003100506
 WO03093465
 US6693075
 US6762286
 US2004220106
 WO2004111242
 WO2005123916
 US2006240526
 US2007037746
 WO2007022512
 WO2007031559
 US7427592
 US7442524
    - BJELKE ET AL.: "A loop of coagulation factor Vlla influencing macromolecular substrate specificity", FEBS LETTERS, vol. 581, no. 1, 2006, pages 71 - 76
    - DICKINSON C D, KELLY C R, RUF W, "Identification of surface residues mediating tissue factor binding and catalytic function of the serine protease factor VIIa", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19961201), vol. 93, no. 25, doi:10.1073/pnas.93.25.14379, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14379 - 14384, XP002273439

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.25.14379
    - WILLIAMSON, J THROMB HAEMOST, vol. 3, 2005, pages 1250 - 6
    - DICKINSON ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA., vol. 93, 1996, pages 14379 - 14384
    - PERSSON ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 98, 2001, pages 13583 - 13588
    - PERSSON ET AL., ART. THROMB. VASC. BIOL., vol. 27, no. 3, 2007, pages 683 - 689
    - LISMAN ET AL., J. THROMB. HAEM., vol. 1, 2003, pages 2175 - 2178
    - GHOSH ET AL., AM. SOCIETY. HEMATOL. MEETING, 10 December 2007 (2007-12-10)
    - RUF, BIOCHEM, vol. 38, 1999, pages 1957 - 1966
    - HARVEY, J BIOL CHEM, vol. 278, 2003, pages 8363 - 8369
    - BERNOIST; CHAMBON, NATURE, vol. 290, 1981, pages 304 - 310
    - YAMAMOTO, CELL, vol. 22, 1980, pages 787 - 797
    - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 78, 1981, pages 1441 - 1445
    - BRINSTER ET AL., NATURE, vol. 296, 1982, pages 39 - 42
    - JAY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 78, 1981, pages 5543
    - DEBOER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 80, 1983, pages 21 - 25
    - "Useful Proteins from Recombinant Bacteria", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, vol. 242, 1980, pages 79 - 94
    - HERRAR-ESTRELLA ET AL., NATURE, vol. 303, 1984, pages 209 - 213
    - GARDER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., vol. 9, 1981, pages 2871
    - HERRERA-ESTRELLA ET AL., NATURE, vol. 310, 1984, pages 115 - 120
    - SWIFT ET AL., CELL, vol. 38, 1984, pages 639 - 646
    - ORNITZ ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., vol. 50, 1986, pages 399 - 409
    - MACDONALD, HEPATOLOGY, vol. 7, 1987, pages 425 - 515
    - HANAHAN ET AL., NATURE, vol. 315, 1985, pages 115 - 122
    - GROSSCHEDL ET AL., CELL, vol. 38, 1984, pages 647 - 658
    - ADAMS ET AL., NATURE, vol. 318, 1985, pages 533 - 538
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., vol. 7, 1987, pages 1436 - 1444
    - LEDER ET AL., CELL, vol. 45, 1986, pages 485 - 495
    - PINCKERT ET AL., GENES AND DEVEL., vol. 1, 1987, pages 268 - 276
    - KRUMLAUF ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., vol. 5, 1985, pages 1639 - 1648
    - HAMMER ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 235, 1987, pages 53 - 58
    - KELSEY ET AL., GENES AND DEVEL., vol. 1, 1987, pages 161 - 171
    - MOGRAM ET AL., NATURE, vol. 315, 1985, pages 338 - 340
    - KOLLIAS ET AL., CELL, vol. 46, 1986, pages 89 - 94
    - READHEAD ET AL., CELL, vol. 48, 1987, pages 703 - 712
    - SHANI, NATURE, vol. 314, 1985, pages 283 - 286
    - MASON ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 234, 1986, pages 1372 - 1378
    - HIGASHI ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, vol. 271, 1996, pages 26569 - 26574
    - HARVEY ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, vol. 278, pages 8363 - 8369
    - "CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY", 1992, JOHN WILEY & SONS
    - GEROTZIAFAS ET AL., AM J HEMATOL, vol. 69, 2002, pages 219 - 222
    - SHAMI ET AL., LIVER TRANSPL, vol. 9, 2003, pages 138 - 143
    - MOSCARDO ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL, vol. 113, 2001, pages 174 - 176
    - DEVERAS ET AL., ANN INTEN MED, vol. 137, 2002, pages 884 - 888
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.