blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2307420

EP2307420 - NALMEFENE DI-ESTER PRODRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2012
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.12.2012  [2012/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
[2011/47]
Former [2011/15]For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Inventor(s)01 / GUILLAUME, Michel, Joseph, Maurice, André
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
02 / GAEKENS, Tim
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
 [2011/48]
Former [2011/15]01 / GUILLAUME, Michel, Joseph, Maurice, André
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
02 / GAEKENS, Tim
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
Representative(s)Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard
Johnson & Johnson
Patent Law Department
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
[N/P]
Former [2011/48]Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., J&J Patent Law Department, Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Former [2011/15]Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., J&J Patent Law Department, Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Application number, filing date09734161.423.04.2009
[2011/15]
WO2009EP54875
Priority number, dateEP2008015509224.04.2008         Original published format: EP 08155092
[2011/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009130270
Date:29.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2307420
Date:13.04.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2307420
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.2009
ClassificationIPC:C07D489/08, A61K31/485, A61P25/32
[2011/15]
CPC:
C07D489/08 (EP,US); A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/15]
Extension statesAL24.11.2010
BA24.11.2010
RS24.11.2010
TitleGerman:NALMEFENDIESTERPRODRUGS[2011/15]
English:NALMEFENE DI-ESTER PRODRUGS[2011/15]
French:PROMÉDICAMENTS DIESTERS DE NALMÉFÈNE[2011/15]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2010National basic fee paid 
24.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/15]
01.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2011Fee for grant paid
14.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2011
Opposition(s)31.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC30.04.2012
[2012/50]
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0250796  (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1-13* claims 1,2; table 1 *;
 [A]EP0615756  (NAT SCIENCE COUNCIL [TW]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * * figures 19,20; table 2 *;
 [A]WO2007110636  (RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 6, lines 25,26; figure 4; examples J,K; claims 1,16,17,21 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.