blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2330892

EP2330892 - PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT À L'AIDE DE MÉDICAMENTS DÉSACTIVANT L'AMMONIAC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.06.2017  [2017/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Horizon Therapeutics, LLC
150 S. Saunders Rd.
Lake Forest IL 60045 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
Horizon Therapeutics, Inc.
150 S. Saunders Rd.
Lake Forest IL 60045 / US
Former [2016/26]For all designated states
Horizon Therapeutics, Inc.
2000 Sierra Point Parkway
Suite 400
Brisbane, CA 94005 / US
Former [2015/41]For all designated states
Horizon Therapeutics, Inc.
2000 Sierra Point Parkway
Suite 400
Brisbane, CA 94005 / US
Former [2014/39]For all designated states
Hyperion Therapeutics, Inc.
2000 Sierra Point Parkway
Suite 400
Brisbane, CA 94005 / US
Former [2012/27]For all designated states
Hyperion Therapeutics, Inc.
601 Gateway Boulevard, Suite 200
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Former [2011/24]For all designated states
Ucyclyd Pharma, Inc.
7720 North dobson Road
Scottsdale, AZ 85256 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHARSCHMIDT, Bruce
Hyperion Therapeutics
601 Gateway Boulevard
Suite 200
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
 [2016/26]
Former [2011/24]01 / SCHARSCHMIDT, Bruce
Hyperion Therapeutics 601 Gateway Boulevard Suite 200
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Representative(s)Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/26]
Former [2011/24]Trueman, Lucy Petra
Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date09739263.307.01.2009
[2011/24]
WO2009US30362
Priority number, dateUS2008009323429.08.2008         Original published format: US 93234
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009134460
Date:05.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2330892
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2330892
Date:29.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2011
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/68
[2016/10]
CPC:
A61K31/19 (EP,GB,US); A61K31/216 (US); A61K31/192 (GB,US);
A61P13/00 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP); G01N33/6812 (EP,GB,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,GB,US); G01N2800/085 (EP,US); G01N2800/347 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2011/24]A01N37/10, A61K31/19
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/26]
Former [2011/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON AMMONIAKFÄNGER-ARZNEISTOFFEN[2011/24]
English:METHODS OF TREATMENT USING AMMONIA-SCAVENGING DRUGS[2011/24]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT À L'AIDE DE MÉDICAMENTS DÉSACTIVANT L'AMMONIAC[2011/24]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2011National basic fee paid 
28.03.2011Search fee paid 
28.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
02.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2016Fee for grant paid
17.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16176456.8  / EP3133396
EP18192516.5   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 05.10.2018
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2013
Opposition(s)30.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4284647  (BRUSILOW SAUL W, et al);
 [Y]US5968979  (BRUSILOW SAUL W [US]);
 [Y]US2004229948  (SUMMAR MARSHALL L [US], et al)
by applicantUS5968979
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.