blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2318419

EP2318419 - BORONATE ESTER COMPOUNDS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.09.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2024Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 30.10.2024  [2024/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-8645 / JP
[2023/12]
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
40 Landsdowne Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ELLIOTT, Eric, L.
35 N. Crescent Circuit
Brighton MA 02135 / US
02 / FERDOUS, Abu, J.
5 Squire Road
Winchester MA 01890 / US
03 / KAUFMAN, Michael, J.
230 Waltham Street
Lexington MA 02421 / US
04 / KOMAR, Sonja, A.
68 Thomas Street
Belmont MA 02478 / US
05 / MAZAIK, Debra, L.
125 Wilson Street
Holliston MA 01746 / US
06 / MCCUBBIN, Quentin, J.
58 Pinehurst Road
Belmont MA 02478 / US
07 / NGUYEN, Phoung, M.
126 Gore Street 4
Cambridge MA 02141 / US
08 / PALANIAPPAN, Vaithianathan
7 Spruce Circle
Andover MA 01810 / US
09 / SKWIERCZYNSKI, Raymond, D.
122 Salem Street
Andover MA 01810 / US
10 / TRUONG, Nobel, T.
26 Stallbrook Street
Milford MA 01757 / US
11 / VARGA, Csanad, M.
83 Commonwealth Park W
Newton MA 02459 / US
12 / ZAWANEH, Peter, N.
854 Massachusetts Avenue
12
Cambridge MA 02139 / US
 [2014/43]
Former [2011/19]01 / ELLIOTT, Eric, L.
35 N. Crescent Circuit
Brighton MA 02135 / US
02 / FERDOUS, Abu, J.
5 Squire Road
Winchester MA 01890 / US
03 / KAUFMAN, Michael, J.
230 Waltham Street
Lexington MA 02421 / US
04 / KOMAR, Sonja, A.
68 Thomas Street
Belmont MA 02478 / US
05 / MAZAIK, Debra, L.
44 Pleasant Street
Hopkinton MA 01748 / US
06 / MCCUBBIN, Quentin, J.
104 Cross Street
Belmont MA 02478 / US
07 / NGUYEN, Phoung, M.
129 Franklin Street, No. 218
Cambridge MA 02139 / US
08 / PALANIAPPAN, Vaithianathan
7 Spruce Circle
Andover MA 01810 / US
09 / SKWIERCZYNSKI, Raymond, D.
122 Salem Street
Andover MA 01810 / US
10 / TRUONG, Nobel, T.
26 Stallbrook Street
Milford MA 01757 / US
11 / VARGA, Csanad, M.
95 Jackson Street
Cambridge MA 02140 / US
12 / ZAWANEH, Peter, N.
854 Massachusetts Avenue 12
Cambridge MA 02139 / US
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2024/44]
Former [2011/19]Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date09767050.916.06.2009
[2011/19]
WO2009US03602
Priority number, dateUS20080132244P17.06.2008         Original published format: US 132244 P
US20090211499P31.03.2009         Original published format: US 211499 P
[2011/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009154737
Date:23.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2318419
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2318419
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2318419
Date:30.10.2024
Language:EN
[2024/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.2009
ClassificationIPC:C07F5/02, C07F5/04, C07F5/06, A61K38/05, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, C07K5/06, C07K5/078
[2014/13]
CPC:
C07K5/06139 (EP,CN,US); A61K31/69 (EP,CN,KR,US); C07F5/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,CN,US); A61K31/454 (EP,CN,US); A61K47/183 (CN);
A61K9/0019 (CN); A61K9/19 (CN); A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP); A61P1/16 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP); A61P17/00 (EP); A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP); A61P25/14 (EP); A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP); A61P27/02 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/18 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP); A61P35/04 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP); C07C233/83 (EP,US);
C07F5/02 (CN); C07F5/025 (EP,CN,US); C07F5/05 (KR);
C07K5/06191 (EP,CN,US); A61K38/00 (CN) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (CN)
Former IPC [2011/19]C07F5/02, C07F5/04, C07F5/06, A61K38/05, A61P35/00, A61P29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2024/44]
Former [2011/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL17.01.2011
BA17.01.2011
RS17.01.2011
TitleGerman:BORONATESTERVERBINDUNGEN UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON[2011/19]
English:BORONATE ESTER COMPOUNDS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF[2011/19]
French:COMPOSÉS DE BORATES ESTERS ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DES COMPOSÉS[2011/19]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2011National basic fee paid 
17.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/19]
26.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2015Fee for grant paid
18.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13191409.5  / EP2730579
EP13191412.9  / EP2730580
EP13191413.7  / EP2733147
EP13191414.5  / EP2730581
EP19150417.4  / EP3536693
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly, et al, et al
Waterways House
Grand Canal Quay
Dublin D02 PD39 / IE
 02  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
124 Dvora HaNevi'a St.
6944020 Tel Aviv / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2021/47]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly, et al, et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 02  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
124 Dvora HaNevi'a St.
6944020 Tel Aviv / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2021/20]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly, et al, et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 02  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/40]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly, et al, et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 02  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/02]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 02  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2016/13]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
 02  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan, et al, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
O'Connell, Maura, et al, et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
 02  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
von Seebach, Malte, et al, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.01.2016  20.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan, et al, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
16.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.10.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.10.2022Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
21.12.2022Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.11.2023Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
15.03.2024Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.03.2024Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.06.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition19.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2785/17
26.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2022Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
06.10.2022Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
23.06.2022Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO02059130  (US HEALTH [US]);
 [X]US2002188100  (PLAMONDON LOUIS [US], et al);
 [X]US2005282742  (PLAMONDON LOUIS [US], et al)
OppositionWO02059131
 WO2005021558
 US2007185060
 WO9613266
 US5780454
 WO02059130
 WO02096933
 US2002188100
 WO03105860
 US6713446
 WO2004064755
 WO2005016859
 US2005282742
 WO2006086600
 WO2009020448
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.