blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Dates prévues pour la maintenance

Interruptions régulières:
entre 5 h 00 et 5 h 15 HEC, du lundi au dimanche.

Autres interruptions
Accessibilité

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

Flash Info

La Lettonie participe au Registre fédéré
Cliquez ici pour plus d'informations sur le Registre fédéré.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2320940

EP2320940 - ANTICORPS HUMAINS QUI SE LIENT AU GÈNE 3 D'ACTIVATION DES LYMPHOCYTES (LAG-3), ET LEURS UTILISATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. R. Squibb & Sons, L.L.C.
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[2014/51]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
Medarex, L.L.C.
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
Former [2011/20]For all designated states
Medarex, Inc.
Route 206 & Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THUDIUM, Kent, B.
521 Cottonwood Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
02 / KORMAN, Alan, J.
521 Cottonwood Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
03 / LEBLANC, Heidi
521 Cottonwood Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
04 / YAMANAKA, Mark
521 Cottonwood Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
05 / SELBY, Mark
521 Cottonwood Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
06 / ZENS, Kyra, D.
521 Cottonwood Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
 [2011/20]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstraße 4
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Former [2011/20]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date09807162.411.08.2009
[2011/20]
WO2009US53405
Priority number, dateUS20080188548P11.08.2008         Original published format: US 188548 P
[2011/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2010019570
Date:18.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2320940
Date:18.05.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2320940
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.06.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2012
ClassificationIPC:C12N5/16
[2014/34]
CPC:
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61P31/12 (EP,IL); A61P31/18 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR); A61P35/02 (EP,IL); A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL); A61P43/00 (EP,IL); C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (KR); C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/73 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2013/04]A61K39/00, C07K17/00, A61K39/395, A61K51/10, C07K16/28
Former IPC [2011/20]A61K39/00, C07K17/00, A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/20]
TitleGerman:LYMPHOZYTENAKTIVIERUNGSGEN-3 (LAG-3) BINDENDE HUMANE ANTIKÖRPER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2011/20]
English:HUMAN ANTIBODIES THAT BIND LYMPHOCYTE ACTIVATION GENE-3 (LAG-3), AND USES THEREOF[2011/20]
French:ANTICORPS HUMAINS QUI SE LIENT AU GÈNE 3 D'ACTIVATION DES LYMPHOCYTES (LAG-3), ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2011/20]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2011National basic fee paid 
02.02.2011Search fee paid 
02.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/20]
09.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2015Fee for grant paid
19.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15156647.8  / EP2905030
EP19186310.9  / EP3597216
EP22185991.1  / EP4147714
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2013
Opposition(s)07.12.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO9110682  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al);
 [XAI]WO9530750  (ROUSSY INST GUSTAVE [FR], et al);
International search[A]WO9703695  (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [AN], et al);
 [A]US6143273  (FAURE FLORENCE [FR], et al);
 [A]WO0069914  (OXFORD BIOMEDICA LTD [GB], et al);
 [Y]US6197524  (ROMAGNANI SERGIO [IT]);
 [A]US2002086014  (KORMAN ALAN J [US], et al);
 [A]US2002146753  (DITZEL HENRIK [US], et al);
 [A]US2003059937  (RUBEN STEVEN M [US], et al);
 [A]US2003129601  (COLE STEWART T [FR]);
 [A]US2004072164  (MARUYAMA TOSHIAKI [US], et al);
 [A]US2005009136  (NIXON ANDREW [US], et al);
 [A]WO2005034733  (LONG ISLAND JEWISH RES INST [US], et al);
 [A]US2005226876  (GRAUS YVO [NL], et al);
 [A]WO2006007850  (SYMPHOGEN AS [DK], et al);
 [Y]US2006177442  (VON STRANDMANN ELKE P [DE], et al);
 [X]US2006240024  (PARDOLL DREW M [US], et al);
 [A]US2007004910  (SEXTON DANIEL J [US], et al);
 [A]US2007160598  (DENNIS MARK S [US], et al);
 [A]WO2008007648  (INST ANTIBODIES CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]US2008069822  (JENSEN ALLAN [DK], et al);
 [AE]WO2008132601  (IMMUTEP [FR], et al);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.